OH HB501 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-3)
Status: Engrossed on December 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-10 - Introduced
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-10 - Introduced
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 955.16, 4729.531, 4729.532, 4741.01, 4741.02, 4741.17, 4741.171, 4741.19, 4741.22, 4741.221, and 4741.24 of the Revised Code to change professional title of "registered veterinary technician" to "registered veterinary nurse."
Title
Change title of veterinary technician to veterinary nurse
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-12-06 - House - House Passed (Y: 60 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-10 | Senate | Introduced |
2018-12-06 | House | Passed |
2018-04-11 | House | Reported: Agriculture and Rural Development |
2018-02-20 | House | Refer to Committee: Agriculture and Rural Development |
2018-02-13 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
47 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
47 | 29 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
47 | 29 | 531 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 29 | 532 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 41 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
47 | 41 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 41 | 02 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 41 | 17 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 41 | 171 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 41 | 19 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 41 | 22 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 41 | 221 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 41 | 24 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
9 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
9 | 55 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
9 | 55 | 16 | Amended Code | Citation Text |