OH HB414 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 52-23)
Status: Passed on March 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-12 - Effective 3/12/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To enact section 5.243 of the Revised Code to designate July 16 as "National Atomic Veterans Day" in Ohio.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designate National Atomic Veterans Day

Sponsors

Rep. Timothy Schaffer [R]Sen. Terry Johnson [R]Rep. Darrell Kick [R]Sen. Hearcel Craig [D]
Rep. Richard Brown [D]Rep. Al Landis [R]Rep. Eugene Miller [D]Rep. Rick Perales [R]
Rep. Craig Riedel [R]Rep. Paul Zeltwanger [R]Rep. Marlene Anielski [R]Sen. Nickie Antonio [D]
Rep. Steven Arndt [R]Rep. Louis Blessing [R]Rep. John Boccieri [D]Rep. Kristin Boggs [D]
Rep. Barbara Boyd [D]Sen. Andrew Brenner [R]Rep. James Butler [R]Rep. Robert Cupp [R]
Rep. Jonathan Dever [R]Rep. Jay Edwards [R]Rep. Keith Faber [R]Rep. Teresa Fedor [D]
Rep. Tavia Galonski [D]Sen. Theresa Gavarone [R]Rep. Timothy Ginter [R]Rep. Doug Green [R]
Rep. Dave Greenspan [R]Rep. Christina Hagan [R]Rep. Glenn Holmes [D]Rep. James Hoops [R]
Sen. Jim Hughes [R]Rep. Laura Lanese [R]Rep. David Leland [D]Rep. Michele Lepore-Hagan [D]
Rep. Riordan McClain [R]Rep. Michael O'Brien [D]Rep. John Patterson [D]Rep. Thomas Patton [R]
Sen. Bill Reineke [R]Sen. Kristina Roegner [R]Rep. John Rogers [D]Sen. Mark Romanchuk [R]
Rep. Scott Ryan [R]Rep. William Seitz [R]Rep. Michael Sheehy [D]Rep. Ryan Smith [R]
Rep. Robert Sprague [R]Sen. Vernon Sykes [D]Rep. Thomas West [D]Rep. Ron Young [R]
Sen. Joseph Uecker [R]Sen. Robert Hackett [R]Sen. Frank Hoagland [R]Sen. Kevin Bacon [R]
Sen. Bill Beagle [R]Sen. Edna Brown [D]Sen. Dave Burke [R]Sen. Matthew Dolan [R]
Sen. John Eklund [R]Sen. Jay Hottinger [R]Sen. Matt Huffman [R]Sen. Stephanie Kunze [R]
Sen. Frank LaRose [R]Sen. Peggy Lehner [R]Rep. Gayle Manning [R]Sen. Robert McColley [R]
Sen. Larry Obhof [R]Sen. Scott Oelslager [R]Sen. Bob Peterson [R]Sen. Joseph Schiavoni [D]
Sen. Cecil Thomas [D]Sen. Sandra Williams [D]Sen. Kenny Yuko [D]

Roll Calls

2018-11-28 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-28 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - House - House Passed (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-12 Effective 3/12/19
2018-11-28SenatePassed
2018-11-28SenateReported: Local Government, Public Safety and Veterans Affairs
2018-09-25SenateRefer to Committee: Local Government, Public Safety and Veterans Affairs
2018-06-11SenateIntroduced
2018-06-07HousePassed
2018-03-01HouseReported: Armed Services, Veterans Affairs, and Homeland Security
2017-11-28HouseRefer to Committee: Armed Services, Veterans Affairs, and Homeland Security
2017-11-14HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback