OH HB38 | 2009-2010 | 128th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-14)
Status: Engrossed on October 28 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-10-29 - To Highways & Transportation
Pending: Senate Highways and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on October 28 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-10-29 - To Highways & Transportation
Pending: Senate Highways and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
To enact section 4503.701 of the Revised Code to create Prince Hall Freemason license plates.
Title
To create Prince Hall Freemason license plates.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-10-29 | To Highways & Transportation | |
2009-10-29 | Introduced to Senate | |
2009-10-28 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2009-10-21 | Committee Report* S | |
2009-02-19 | To *Transportation & Infrastructure | |
2009-02-19 | Introduced to House |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
45 | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
45 | 03 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
45 | 03 | 701 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Ohio State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://archives.legislature.state.oh.us/bills.cfm?ID=128_HB_38 |
Text | http://archives.legislature.state.oh.us/BillText128/128_HB_38_PH_Y.html |