OH HB373 | 2013-2014 | 130th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 45-22)
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-27 - To Transportation
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-27 - To Transportation
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
To enact section 5533.471 of the Revised Code to designate a portion of State Route 264 within the city of Cincinnati as the "Elder High School Vietnam Veterans Memorial Highway"; to authorize the Director of Transportation to erect suitable markers along the highway indicating its name; and to authorize Elder High School, subject to approval by the Director, to erect auxiliary markers on a periodic basis indicating the name of one of the eleven Elder High School graduates who died during the Vietnam conflict.
Title
To designate a portion of State Route 264 within the city of Cincinnati as the "Elder High School Vietnam Veterans Memorial Highway"; to authorize the Director of Transportation to erect suitable markers along the highway indicating its name; and to authorize Elder High School, subject to approval by the Director, to erect auxiliary markers on a periodic basis indicating the name of one of the eleven Elder High School graduates who died during the Vietnam conflict.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-26 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-27 | To Transportation | |
2014-03-27 | Introduced to Senate | |
2014-03-26 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2014-03-12 | Committee Report | |
2013-12-04 | To Transportation, Public Safety and Homeland Security | |
2013-12-04 | Introduced to House |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
55 | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
55 | 33 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
55 | 33 | 471 | New Code | See Bill Text |