OH HB362 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-11 - Effective 5/11/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-11 - Effective 5/11/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 5505.16, 5505.162, 5505.17, 5505.174, 5505.18, and 5505.59 of the Revised Code to revise the law governing the State Highway Patrol Retirement System.
Title
Revise State Highway Patrol Retirement System Law
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-05 - House - House Passed (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-07 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-05 - House - House Passed (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-07 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-11 | Effective 5/11/18 | |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Passed |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Reported: Insurance and Financial Institutions |
2017-12-13 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Insurance and Financial Institutions |
2017-12-11 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-12-05 | House | Passed |
2017-11-07 | House | Reported - Amended: Aging and Long Term Care |
2017-10-10 | House | Refer to Committee: Aging and Long Term Care |
2017-09-26 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement : Law Enforcement
Retirement
State and Local Government : Public Officials and Employees
Retirement
State and Local Government : Public Officials and Employees
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
55 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
55 | 05 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
55 | 05 | 16 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
55 | 05 | 162 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
55 | 05 | 17 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
55 | 05 | 174 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
55 | 05 | 18 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
55 | 05 | 59 | Amended Code | Citation Text |