OH HB283 | 2007-2008 | 127th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 12 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-09-12 - Effective Date
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 12 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-09-12 - Effective Date
Summary
To amend sections 2947.23, 3715.521, 3715.55, 3715.63, 4729.41, 4729.51, and 4729.54 and to enact sections 2947.231, 3715.88, 3715.89, 3715.90, 3715.91, 3715.92, and 4729.541 of the Revised Code to permit pharmacy schools to accept for instructional purposes donations of certain dangerous drugs, including expired drugs, to eliminate the requirement that certain professional business entities be licensed as a terminal distributor of dangerous drugs, and to permit the Board of Pharmacy to recover investigation costs in certain cases.
Title
Donations of dangerous drugs-pharmacy schools accept for instructional purposes
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-09-12 | Effective Date | |
2008-06-12 | Governor Action | |
2008-06-17 | End of 10-day Period | |
2008-06-05 | Sent to Governor | |
2008-05-28 | Concurrence | |
2008-05-22 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2008-05-21 | Committee Report | |
2007-12-06 | To Health, Human Services, & Aging | |
2007-12-06 | Introduced to Senate | |
2007-12-04 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2007-10-25 | Committee Report | |
2007-07-05 | To Health | |
2007-07-05 | Introduced to House |
Ohio State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://archives.legislature.state.oh.us/bills.cfm?ID=127_HB_283 |