OH HB271 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 48-13)
Status: Enrolled on December 12 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-12 - Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on December 12 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-12 - Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To enact section 4112.16 of the Revised Code to authorize an alleged aggrieved party to provide a notice of an alleged accessibility law violation in advance of filing a civil action and to establish the circumstances under which an alleged aggrieved party is entitled to attorney's fees in a civil action based on the violation.
Title
Give notice before action for access; allow attorney's fees
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-12-12 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-06 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House Passed (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-06 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House Passed (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-12 | Senate | Passed |
2018-12-06 | Senate | Reported: Judiciary |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Judiciary |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Introduced |
2018-02-28 | House | Passed |
2018-02-01 | House | Reported - Substitute: Civil Justice |
2017-06-20 | House | Refer to Committee: Civil Justice |
2017-06-12 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
41 | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
41 | 12 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 12 | 16 | New Code | See Bill Text |