OH HB261 | 2013-2014 | 130th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 17-6)
Status: Passed on July 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-10 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 17-6)
Status: Passed on July 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-10 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
To amend sections 141.04, 141.13, 1901.10, 1901.12, 1907.14, 2701.03, 2701.031, 2743.03, 2743.04, 2743.09, 2743.121, 2743.20, 2743.52, 2743.53, 2743.531, 2743.55, 2743.60, 2743.601, 2743.61, 2743.62, 2743.63, 2743.64, 2743.65, 2743.66, 2743.67, 2743.68, 2743.69, and 2743.71, to enact new section 1901.121 and sections 1901.122, 1901.123, 1907.141, 1907.142, 1907.143, and 2743.041, and to repeal sections 1901.121 and 2743.54 of the Revised Code to abolish the office of the Court of Claims commissioner, to transfer the powers of a judge of the Court of Claims to the court; to specify certain powers of a Court of Claims magistrate, to modify the Attorney General's annual report on the crime victims compensation program, to conform existing law to the existing filing period for filing a claim for reparations by an adult, to eliminate the procedure for filing an affidavit of disqualification for a judge of a municipal or county court and instead include the disqualification of a judge of a municipal or county court and a judge of the court of claims within the procedure for filing an affidavit of disqualification for a probate judge, a judge of a court of appeals, and a judge of the court of common pleas, to change the basis of the per diem compensation of a retired judge who serves on the Court of Claims from the annual compensation of a judge of a court of appeals to the annual compensation of a judge of a court of common pleas, to modify the methods of filling a vacant municipal or county court judgeship, of assigning an additional judge for a municipal court, and of compensating the new or additional judge and to modify the procedure for reimbursing counties for compensating such judges.
Title
To abolish the office of the Court of Claims commissioner, to transfer the powers of a judge of the Court of Claims to the court; to specify certain powers of a Court of Claims magistrate, to modify the Attorney General's annual report on the crime victims compensation program, to conform existing law to the existing filing period for filing a claim for reparations by an adult, to eliminate the procedure for filing an affidavit of disqualification for a judge of a municipal or county court and instead include the disqualification of a judge of a municipal or county court and a judge of the court of claims within the procedure for filing an affidavit of disqualification for a probate judge, a judge of a court of appeals, and a judge of the court of common pleas, to change the basis of the per diem compensation of a retired judge who serves on the Court of Claims from the annual compensation of a judge of a court of appeals to the annual compensation of a judge of a court of common pleas, to modify the methods of filling a vacant municipal or county court judgeship, of assigning an additional judge for a municipal court, and of compensating the new or additional judge and to modify the procedure for reimbursing counties for compensating such judges.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-26 - House - House - SA Concurred in (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-25 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-25 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-10 | Effective Date | |
2014-04-10 | Governor' Action | |
2014-04-12 | End of 10-day period | |
2014-04-01 | Sent to Governor | |
2014-03-26 | Concurrence | |
2014-03-25 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2014-03-12 | Committee Report - S | |
2014-01-30 | To Civil Justice | |
2014-01-30 | Introduced to Senate | |
2014-01-29 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2013-12-05 | Committee Report - A | |
2013-09-10 | To Judiciary | |
2013-09-10 | Introduced to House |