OH HB25 | 2011-2012 | 129th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-06-22 - To Judiciary Criminal Justice
Pending: Senate Judiciary - Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-06-22 - To Judiciary Criminal Justice
Pending: Senate Judiciary - Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
To amend sections 959.99, 2152.19, 2903.213, 2903.214, 2919.26, 3113.31, 4732.141, and 4757.33 and to enact section 4731.284 of the Revised Code to revise the penalties and sentencing provisions regarding violations of the cruelty to animals statutes and to include the protection of companion animals in temporary protection orders, domestic violence protection orders, anti-stalking protection orders, and related protection orders.
Title
To revise the penalties and sentencing provisions regarding violations of the cruelty to animals statutes and to include the protection of companion animals in temporary protection orders, domestic violence protection orders, anti-stalking protection orders, and related protection orders.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-21 - House - House - Third Consideration (Y: 89 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-22 | To Judiciary Criminal Justice | |
2011-06-22 | Introduced to Senate | |
2011-06-21 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2011-05-25 | Committee Report - S | |
2011-01-18 | To Criminal Justice | |
2011-01-18 | Introduced to House |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
21 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
21 | 52 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
21 | 52 | 19 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
29 | 03 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
29 | 03 | 213 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 03 | 214 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 19 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
29 | 19 | 26 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
31 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
31 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
31 | 13 | 31 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
47 | 31 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
47 | 31 | 284 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 32 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
47 | 32 | 141 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 57 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
47 | 57 | 33 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
9 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
9 | 55 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
9 | 55 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
9 | 59 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
9 | 59 | 99 | Amended Code | Citation Text |