OH HB230 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on December 12 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-06-02 - Reported: Health, Human Services and Medicaid
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To enact section 5.2313 of the Revised Code to designate the month of May as "Brain Cancer Awareness Month."

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designate Brain Cancer Awareness Month

Sponsors

Rep. Jeffrey Crossman [D]Rep. Brian Baldridge [R]Rep. Gil Blair [D]Rep. Kristin Boggs [D]
Rep. Juanita Brent [D]Rep. Richard Brown [D]Rep. James Butler [R]Rep. Jamie Callender [R]
Rep. Rick Carfagna [R]Rep. Sara Carruthers [R]Rep. Randi Clites [D]Rep. Erica Crawley [D]
Rep. Jon Cross [R]Rep. Robert Cupp [R]Rep. Sedrick Denson [D]Rep. Jay Edwards [R]
Rep. Mark Fraizer [R]Rep. Tavia Galonski [D]Rep. Haraz Ghanbari [R]Rep. Timothy Ginter [R]
Rep. Doug Green [R]Rep. Stephen Hambley [R]Rep. Paula Hicks-Hudson [D]Rep. Brett Hudson Hillyer [R]
Rep. James Hoops [R]Rep. Catherine Ingram [D]Rep. Don Jones [R]Sen. Kris Jordan [R]
Rep. Brigid Kelly [D]Rep. Darrell Kick [R]Rep. Kyle Koehler [R]Rep. Jeff LaRe [R]
Rep. Laura Lanese [R]Rep. David Leland [D]Rep. Michele Lepore-Hagan [D]Rep. Mary Lightbody [D]
Rep. Scott Lipps [R]Rep. Beth Liston [D]Rep. Don Manning [R]Rep. Gayle Manning [R]
Rep. Adam Miller [D]Rep. Jessica Miranda [D]Rep. Michael O'Brien [D]Sen. Scott Oelslager [R]
Rep. John Patterson [D]Rep. Thomas Patton [R]Rep. Rick Perales [R]Rep. Phil Plummer [R]
Rep. Bill Reineke [R]Rep. Tracy Richardson [R]Rep. Craig Riedel [R]Rep. Phil Robinson [D]
Rep. Bill Roemer [R]Rep. John Rogers [D]Rep. Mark Romanchuk [R]Rep. Allison Russo [D]
Rep. Gary Scherer [R]Rep. William Seitz [R]Rep. Michael Sheehy [D]Rep. Michael Skindell [D]
Rep. Kent Smith [D]Rep. Todd Smith [R]Rep. Lisa Sobecki [D]Rep. Dick Stein [R]
Rep. Jason Stephens [R]Rep. Fred Strahorn [D]Rep. Bride Sweeney [D]Rep. Emilia Strong Sykes [D]
Rep. Terrence Upchurch [D]Rep. Casey Weinstein [D]Rep. Thomas West [D]Rep. Scott Wiggam [R]
Rep. Shane Wilkin [R]

Roll Calls

2020-06-02 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-12 - House - House Passed (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-06 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-02SenateReported: Health, Human Services and Medicaid
2020-02-12SenateRefer to Committee: Health, Human Services and Medicaid
2019-12-17SenateIntroduced
2019-12-12HousePassed
2019-11-06HouseReported: Health
2019-05-08HouseRefer to Committee: Health
2019-05-02HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback