OH HB213 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 19 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-05-26 - Refer to Committee: Veterans and Public Safety
Pending: Senate Veterans and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

To enact section 9.51 of the Revised Code to designate the Honor and Remember flag as the symbol of Ohio's concern and commitment to honoring and remembering the lives of all fallen service members and their families and to require that the flag be displayed at the statehouse in Columbus on Memorial Day.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designate Honor and Remember flag – symbol fallen service members

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-19 - House - House Passed (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-26SenateRefer to Committee: Veterans and Public Safety
2021-05-25SenateIntroduced
2021-05-19HousePassed
2021-05-05HouseReported: Government Oversight
2021-03-17HouseRefer to Committee: Government Oversight
2021-03-16HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Ohio State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-summary?id=GA134-HB-213
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb213/IN/00?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb213/RH/01/hb213_01_RH?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb213/PH/02/hb213_02_PH?format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16266&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16354&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16589&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16729&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16786&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16859&format=pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-votes?id=GA134-HB-213

Bill Comments 750

feedback