OH HB168 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 49-12)
Status: Passed on September 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-15 - Effective 9/15/20
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 49-12)
Status: Passed on September 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-15 - Effective 9/15/20
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 3746.02 and 3746.05 and to enact section 3746.122 of the Revised Code to establish an affirmative defense to a release or threatened release of hazardous substances from a facility for certain bona fide prospective purchasers.
Title
Establish affirmative defense-certain hazardous substance release
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-06 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-04 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - House - House Passed (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-04 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - House - House Passed (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-15 | Effective 9/15/20 | |
2020-05-13 | House | Concurred in Senate amendments |
2020-05-06 | Senate | Passed |
2020-05-06 | Senate | Reported - Amended: Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Recommitted: Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2019-12-04 | Senate | Reported - Amended: Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-05-30 | House | Passed |
2019-05-08 | House | Reported: Civil Justice |
2019-04-02 | House | Refer to Committee: Civil Justice |
2019-03-26 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Courts and Civil Law : Civil Law
Environment and Natural Resources
Environment and Natural Resources : Waste Disposal
Environment and Natural Resources
Environment and Natural Resources : Waste Disposal
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
37 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
37 | 46 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
37 | 46 | 02 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
37 | 46 | 05 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
37 | 46 | 122 | New Code | See Bill Text |