OH HB167 | 2023-2024 | 135th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 27 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-09-13 - Referred to committee: Veterans and Public Safety
Pending: Senate Veterans and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 27 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-09-13 - Referred to committee: Veterans and Public Safety
Pending: Senate Veterans and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend section 109.804 and to enact section 109.791 of the Revised Code to modify the requirements for chief of police training and to allow advanced training for officers at or above the rank of sergeant and to amend the version of section 109.804 of the Revised Code that is scheduled to take effect December 29, 2023, to continue the change on and after that date.
Title
Modify chief of police and certain advanced officer training
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-27 - House - House Passed (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-21 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-21 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-13 | Senate | Referred to committee: Veterans and Public Safety |
2023-09-12 | Senate | Introduced |
2023-06-27 | House | Passed |
2023-06-21 | House | Reported: Homeland Security |
2023-05-23 | House | Referred to committee: Homeland Security |
2023-05-08 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1 | 09 | 791 | New Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 09 | 804 | Amended Code | Citation Text |