OH HB11 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-18 - Effective 9/18/20 - Appropriations effective 06/19/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 5162.20 and 5167.12; to amend, for the purpose of adopting a new section number as indicated in parentheses, section 5164.10 (5164.16); and to enact new section 5164.10 and sections 124.825, 3701.614, 3701.615, and 5164.17 of the Revised Code; and to amend Section 333.10 of H.B. 166 of the 133rd General Assembly to address tobacco cessation and prenatal initiatives and to make an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Regards tobacco cessation and prenatal initiatives

Sponsors

Rep. Gayle Manning [R]Rep. Brian Baldridge [R]Rep. Gil Blair [D]Sen. Louis Blessing [R]
Rep. Kristin Boggs [D]Rep. Janine Boyd [D]Rep. Juanita Brent [D]Rep. Richard Brown [D]
Rep. Rick Carfagna [R]Rep. Sara Carruthers [R]Rep. Jack Cera [D]Rep. Randi Clites [D]
Rep. Erica Crawley [D]Rep. Jeffrey Crossman [D]Rep. Sedrick Denson [D]Rep. Jay Edwards [R]
Rep. Tavia Galonski [D]Rep. Dave Greenspan [R]Rep. Diane Grendell [R]Rep. Stephen Hambley [R]
Rep. Paula Hicks-Hudson [D]Rep. Adam Holmes [R]Rep. Catherine Ingram [D]Rep. Darrell Kick [R]
Rep. Kyle Koehler [R]Rep. Laura Lanese [R]Rep. David Leland [D]Rep. Michele Lepore-Hagan [D]
Rep. Mary Lightbody [D]Rep. Beth Liston [D]Rep. Joe Miller [D]Rep. Jessica Miranda [D]
Rep. Michael O'Brien [D]Sen. Scott Oelslager [R]Rep. John Patterson [D]Rep. Thomas Patton [R]
Rep. Rick Perales [R]Rep. Phil Plummer [R]Rep. Phil Robinson [D]Rep. Bill Roemer [R]
Rep. John Rogers [D]Rep. Allison Russo [D]Rep. Scott Ryan [R]Rep. Gary Scherer [R]
Rep. Michael Sheehy [D]Rep. Michael Skindell [D]Rep. Kent Smith [D]Rep. Todd Smith [R]
Rep. Lisa Sobecki [D]Rep. Dick Stein [R]Rep. Fred Strahorn [D]Rep. Bride Sweeney [D]
Rep. Emilia Strong Sykes [D]Rep. Terrence Upchurch [D]Rep. Casey Weinstein [D]Rep. Thomas West [D]
Sen. Dave Burke [R]Sen. Hearcel Craig [D]Sen. Matthew Dolan [R]Sen. John Eklund [R]
Sen. Theresa Gavarone [R]Sen. Robert Hackett [R]Sen. Frank Hoagland [R]Sen. Jay Hottinger [R]
Sen. Terry Johnson [R]Sen. Stephanie Kunze [R]Sen. Tina Maharath [D]Sen. Nathan Manning [R]
Sen. Sean O'Brien [D]Sen. Larry Obhof [R]Sen. Vernon Sykes [D]Sen. Cecil Thomas [D]
Sen. Sandra Williams [D]Sen. Steve Wilson [R]Sen. Kenny Yuko [D]

Roll Calls

2020-06-10 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - House - House Passed (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - House - House Re-referred (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-18 Effective 9/18/20 - Appropriations effective 06/19/2020
2020-06-11HouseConcurred in Senate amendments
2020-06-10SenatePassed - Amended
2020-06-09SenateReported - Substitute: Health, Human Services and Medicaid
2019-09-11SenateRefer to Committee: Health, Human Services and Medicaid
2019-06-24SenateIntroduced
2019-06-20HousePassed
2019-06-19HouseReported: Finance
2019-06-18HouseRe-referred: Finance
2019-06-11HouseRe-referred - Substitute: Rules and Reference
2019-05-21HouseRefer to Committee: Health
2019-05-16HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
51Amended CodeCitation Text
5162Amended CodeCitation Text
516220Amended CodeCitation Text
5164Amended CodeCitation Text
516410Amended CodeCitation Text
5167Amended CodeCitation Text
516712Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-summary?id=GA133-HB-11
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_133/bills/hb11/IN/00?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_133/bills/hb11/RH/01?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_133/bills/hb11/RCH/02?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_133/bills/hb11/RH/03?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_133/bills/hb11/PH/04?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_133/bills/hb11/RS/05?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_133/bills/hb11/PS/06?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_133/bills/hb11/EN/07?format=pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-votes?id=GA133-HB-11

Bill Comments

feedback