OH HB106 | 2023-2024 | 135th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 30 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-09-13 - Referred to committee: Small Business and Economic Opportunity
Pending: Senate Small Business and Economic Opportunity Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 30 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-09-13 - Referred to committee: Small Business and Economic Opportunity
Pending: Senate Small Business and Economic Opportunity Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To enact section 4113.14 of the Revised Code to enact the Pay Stub Protection Act requiring employers to provide earnings and deductions statements to each of the employer's employees.
Title
Enact the Pay Stub Protection Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-30 - House - House Passed (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-13 | Senate | Referred to committee: Small Business and Economic Opportunity |
2023-09-12 | Senate | Introduced |
2023-06-30 | House | Passed |
2023-06-27 | House | Informally passed |
2023-05-24 | House | Reported: Commerce and Labor |
2023-03-22 | House | Referred to committee: Commerce and Labor |
2023-03-14 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Commerce
Employment
House Commerce and Labor Committee
Senate Small Business and Economic Opportunity Committee
Employment
House Commerce and Labor Committee
Senate Small Business and Economic Opportunity Committee