NY S65091 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on June 29 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-06-29 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 29 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-06-29 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the authority of Sullivan county to impose a sales and compensating use tax within such county.
Title
Extends the authority of Sullivan county to impose a sales and compensating use tax within such county.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-29 | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A8347 (Same As) 2009-07-11 - signed chap.164
S5712 (Same As) 2009-07-11 - signed chap.164
S54330 (Same As) 2009-06-23 - REFERRED TO RULES
S44330 (Same As) 2009-06-28 - REFERRED TO RULES
S5712 (Same As) 2009-07-11 - signed chap.164
S54330 (Same As) 2009-06-23 - REFERRED TO RULES
S44330 (Same As) 2009-06-28 - REFERRED TO RULES