NY S09282 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-08-28 - SIGNED CHAP.283
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-08-28 - SIGNED CHAP.283
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts certain property from the prohibition of alcohol sales within a certain distance of a church within the county of Washington, state of New York.
Title
Exempts certain property from the prohibition of alcohol sales within a certain distance of a church within the county of Washington, state of New York.
Sponsors
Sen. Daniel Stec [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-05-29 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-22 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Economic Development And Small Business Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-29 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-22 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Economic Development And Small Business Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-08-28 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.283 |
2024-08-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2024-05-30 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2024-05-30 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2024-05-30 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.214 |
2024-05-30 | Assembly | substituted for a10201 |
2024-05-29 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2024-05-29 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-05-29 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2024-05-28 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-05-23 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-05-22 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1440 |
2024-05-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS |
Same As/Similar To
A10201 (Same As) 2024-05-30 - substituted by s9282