NY A10201 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 10 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-22 - reported referred to rules
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 10 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-22 - reported referred to rules
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts certain property from the prohibition of alcohol sales within a certain distance of a church within the county of Washington, state of New York.
Title
Exempts certain property from the prohibition of alcohol sales within a certain distance of a church within the county of Washington, state of New York.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Economic Development Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Economic Development Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-22 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2024-05-21 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2024-05-10 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
Same As/Similar To
S09282 (Same As) 2024-05-23 - 2ND REPORT CAL.