NY S09207 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-02 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9442A
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-02 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9442A
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires notification of changes to the model contract with managed care providers under the medical assistance program on the DOH website and in the state register.
Title
Requires notification of changes to the model contract with managed care providers under the medical assistance program on the DOH website and in the state register.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-02 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A9442A |
2022-05-31 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1716 |
2022-05-31 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-05-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A09442 (Same As) 2022-12-30 - approval memo.101