NY A09442 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-30 - approval memo.101
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-30 - approval memo.101
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires notification of changes to the model contract with managed care providers under the medical assistance program on the DOH website and in the state register.
Title
Requires notification of changes to the model contract with managed care providers under the medical assistance program on the DOH website and in the state register.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-30 | Assembly | approval memo.101 |
2022-12-30 | Assembly | signed chap.822 |
2022-12-19 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2022-06-02 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-06-02 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-06-02 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1716 |
2022-06-02 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S9207 |
2022-05-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2022-05-10 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-05-10 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-05-02 | Assembly | amended on third reading 9442a |
2022-04-28 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.566 |
2022-04-26 | Assembly | reported |
2022-03-07 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S09207 (Same As) 2022-06-02 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9442A