NY S09106 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 9 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-01 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2549
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 9 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-01 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2549
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to home visiting services for applicants for, or recipients of, public assistance benefits who are exempt from certain work activities; provides criteria for those eligible for such home visiting services.
Title
Relates to home visiting services for applicants for, or recipients of, public assistance benefits who are exempt from certain work activities; provides criteria for those eligible for such home visiting services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-01 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A2549 |
2022-05-31 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1702 |
2022-05-31 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-05-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO SOCIAL SERVICES |
Same As/Similar To
A02549 (Same As) 2022-12-30 - signed chap.819