NY S09077 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-13 - APPROVAL MEMO.7
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-13 - APPROVAL MEMO.7
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides certain legal protections for abortion service providers including protection from extradition, arrest and legal proceedings in other states relating to abortions legally performed in this state.
Title
Provides certain legal protections for abortion service providers including protection from extradition, arrest and legal proceedings in other states relating to abortions legally performed in this state.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-31 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 100 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 100 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-13 | Senate | APPROVAL MEMO.7 |
2022-06-13 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.219 |
2022-06-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2022-05-31 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-05-31 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-05-31 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.507 |
2022-05-31 | Assembly | substituted for a10372a |
2022-05-31 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2022-05-31 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-31 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-31 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1623 |
2022-05-31 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-05-28 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 9077A |
2022-05-28 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CODES |
2022-05-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A10372 (Same As) 2022-05-31 - substituted by s9077a