NY S09011 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 13 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A11193A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 13 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A11193A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes Edward P. Ackley to take the competitive civil service examination and be placed on the eligible civil service list for employment as a full-time police officer for the village of Hudson Falls.
Title
Authorizes Edward P. Ackley to take the competitive civil service examination and be placed on the eligible civil service list for employment as a full-time police officer for the village of Hudson Falls.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A11193A |
2018-06-20 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.2135 |
2018-06-20 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 9011B |
2018-06-20 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO RULES |
2018-06-19 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 9011A |
2018-06-19 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO RULES |
2018-06-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A11193 (Same As) 2018-07-26 - signed chap.122