NY S08999 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A11118C
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A11118C
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows water works corporations to provide water usage data to municipalities.
Title
Allows water works corporations to provide water usage data to municipalities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A11118C |
2018-06-20 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.2133 |
2018-06-15 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 8999B |
2018-06-15 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO RULES |
2018-06-14 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 8999A |
2018-06-14 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO RULES |
2018-06-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A11118 (Same As) 2018-08-24 - signed chap.261