NY S08949 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 2 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-07 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 2 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-07 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the department of labor to provide a document on workplace rights to any minor seeking working papers and to make such document available in other languages and to school officials who issue working papers.
Title
Requires the department of labor to provide a document on workplace rights to any minor seeking working papers and to make such document available in other languages and to school officials who issue working papers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-07 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2024-05-13 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-05-08 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-05-07 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.936 |
2024-05-02 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 8949A |
2024-05-02 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO LABOR |
2024-04-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
Same As/Similar To
A09796 (Same As) 2024-05-03 - print number 9796a