NY S08897 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 27 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-23 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9543
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 27 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-23 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9543
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for a license to sell liquor at retail for consumption on certain premises located at 2708 Court Street in the town of Salina, Onondaga county.
Title
Provides for a license to sell liquor at retail for consumption on certain premises located at 2708 Court Street in the town of Salina, Onondaga county.
Sponsors
Sen. Rachel May [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A9543 |
2022-05-17 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-05-16 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-05-11 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1327 |
2022-04-27 | Senate | REFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS |
Same As/Similar To
A09543 (Same As) 2022-08-17 - signed chap.520