NY S08859 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-19 - referred to governmental employees
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-19 - referred to governmental employees
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to additional member contributions for certain members under the age fifty-seven retirement program; provides that members holding certain titles who due to their age at the time of enrollment in the age fifty-seven retirement program will not obtain twenty-five years of service credit and therefore will not be eligible for a refund of their additional member contributions shall not be required to make additional member contributions.
Title
Relates to additional member contributions for certain members under the age fifty-seven retirement program; provides that members holding certain titles who due to their age at the time of enrollment in the age fifty-seven retirement program will not obtain twenty-five years of service credit and therefore will not be eligible for a refund of their additional member contributions shall not be required to make additional member contributions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Senate - Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Senate - Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-19 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
2018-06-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-04 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-05-31 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-05-30 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1403 |
2018-05-29 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A11066 (Same As) 2018-06-04 - referred to governmental employees