NY S08850 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-30 - referred to higher education
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-30 - referred to higher education
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to permitting certain not-for-profit corporations engaged in engineering for certain conservation efforts to do business or provide professional engineering, land surveying, or professional geology services in the state.
Title
Relates to permitting certain not-for-profit corporations engaged in engineering for certain conservation efforts to do business or provide professional engineering, land surveying, or professional geology services in the state.
Sponsors
Sen. Jessica Scarcella-Spanton [D] | Sen. Anthony Palumbo [R] | Sen. Robert Rolison [R] | Sen. Alexis Weik [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-05-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 55 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Senate - Senate Higher Education Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Senate - Senate Higher Education Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-30 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
2024-05-30 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-05-30 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2024-05-23 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-05-22 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-05-21 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1333 |
2024-03-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A10016 (Same As) 2024-05-01 - referred to higher education