NY S08829 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-23 - VETOED MEMO.172
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-23 - VETOED MEMO.172
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that a television series that changes the title of the series and/or the principal cast prior to March 31, 2023, shall be considered to remain in continuous production for each season, provided the series films at the same location as prior seasons, is produced by the same entity, and retains at least eighty percent of the staff from the prior season for purposes of being a qualified film for the empire state film production credit.
Title
Provides that a television series that changes the title of the series and/or the principal cast prior to March 31, 2023, shall be considered to remain in continuous production for each season, provided the series films at the same location as prior seasons, is produced by the same entity, and retains at least eighty percent of the staff from the prior season for purposes of being a qualified film for the empire state film production credit.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 103 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-23 | Senate | VETOED MEMO.172 |
2022-12-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.491 |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | substituted for a10034a |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2022-06-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-06-01 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-25 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1577 |
2022-05-25 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-05-02 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 8829A |
2022-05-02 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2022-04-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A10034 (Same As) 2022-06-03 - substituted by s8829a