NY S08791 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on December 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-15 - APPROVAL MEMO.49
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on December 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-15 - APPROVAL MEMO.49
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to costs associated with the establishment of New York state veterans' cemeteries.
Title
Relates to costs associated with the establishment of New York state veterans' cemeteries.
Sponsors
Sen. John Brooks [D] | Sen. Anna Kaplan [D] | Sen. Elizabeth Little [R] | Sen. John Liu [D] |
Sen. Rachel May [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-07-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-15 | Assembly | APPROVAL MEMO.49 |
2020-12-15 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.345 |
2020-12-03 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.362 |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | substituted for a10782 |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2020-07-23 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-23 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-07-22 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.966 |
2020-07-21 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-07-17 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2020-07-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A10782 (Same As) 2020-12-15 - APPROVAL MEMO.49