NY S08774 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-18 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9950B
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-18 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9950B
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes hospitals to establish standing orders for the care of newborns in the hospital until the discharge of the newborn from the hospital following the birth, which may authorize an attending nurse to provide services and care to healthy newborns.
Title
Authorizes hospitals to establish standing orders for the care of newborns in the hospital until the discharge of the newborn from the hospital following the birth, which may authorize an attending nurse to provide services and care to healthy newborns.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-18 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A9950B |
2018-06-11 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 8774B |
2018-06-05 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-06-04 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-06-04 | Senate | AMENDED (T) 8774A |
2018-05-31 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1508 |
2018-05-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A09950 (Same As) 2018-12-07 - signed chap.366