NY A09950 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-7)
Status: Passed on December 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-07 - signed chap.366
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-7)
Status: Passed on December 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-07 - signed chap.366
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes hospitals to establish standing orders for the care of newborns in the hospital until the discharge of the newborn from the hospital following the birth, which may authorize an attending nurse to provide services and care to healthy newborns.
Title
Authorizes hospitals to establish standing orders for the care of newborns in the hospital until the discharge of the newborn from the hospital following the birth, which may authorize an attending nurse to provide services and care to healthy newborns.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-07 | Senate | signed chap.366 |
2018-11-26 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2018-06-18 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-18 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1508 |
2018-06-18 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8774B |
2018-06-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-06-14 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.227 |
2018-06-14 | Assembly | rules report cal.227 |
2018-06-14 | Assembly | reported |
2018-06-11 | Assembly | amend and recommit to rules 9950b |
2018-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-05-30 | Assembly | print number 9950a |
2018-05-30 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to codes |
2018-03-13 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2018-02-27 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S08774 (Same As) 2018-06-18 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9950B