NY S08685 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 30 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-23 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9133
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 30 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-23 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9133
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the appointment and promotion of supervisors of the fire alarm dispatcher service; requires that a promotion be based on merit and fitness as determined by competitive examination, due weight being given to seniority.
Title
Relates to the appointment and promotion of supervisors of the fire alarm dispatcher service; requires that a promotion be based on merit and fitness as determined by competitive examination, due weight being given to seniority.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A9133 |
2022-05-16 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-05-11 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-05-10 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1258 |
2022-03-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A09133 (Same As) 2022-12-16 - tabled