NY S08644 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on November 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-11-23 - VETOED MEMO.45
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on November 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-11-23 - VETOED MEMO.45
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the automatic enrollment of employees of the city of New York eligible to join the New York city board of education retirement system.
Title
Provides for the automatic enrollment of employees of the city of New York eligible to join the New York city board of education retirement system.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Senate - Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Senate - Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-23 | Senate | VETOED MEMO.45 |
2022-11-22 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.620 |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | substituted for a9620 |
2022-05-25 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2022-05-25 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-25 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-23 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1448 |
2022-05-17 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-05-10 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2022-03-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A09620 (Same As) 2022-06-02 - substituted by s8644