NY A09620 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-02 - substituted by s8644
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-02 - substituted by s8644
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the automatic enrollment of employees of the city of New York eligible to join the New York city board of education retirement system.
Title
Provides for the automatic enrollment of employees of the city of New York eligible to join the New York city board of education retirement system.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-02 | Assembly | substituted by s8644 |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | rules report cal.620 |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | reported |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-04-26 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2022-03-28 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S08644 (Same As) 2022-11-23 - VETOED MEMO.45