NY S08598 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on October 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-14 - signed chap.249
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on October 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-14 - signed chap.249
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates June nineteenth, known as Juneteenth, as a public holiday.
Title
Designates June nineteenth, known as Juneteenth, as a public holiday.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-14 | Senate | signed chap.249 |
2020-10-02 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.926 |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8598 |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-07-22 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2020-07-22 | Senate | passed assembly |
2020-07-20 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.212 |
2020-07-20 | Senate | rules report cal.212 |
2020-07-20 | Senate | reported |
2020-07-16 | Senate | reported referred to rules |
2020-06-10 | Senate | referred to governmental operations |
2020-07-23 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A10628 |
2020-07-22 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.926 |
2020-07-20 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-07-20 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-07-14 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO JUDICIARY |
2020-06-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A10628 (Same As) 2020-10-14 - signed chap.249