NY A10628 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Passed on October 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-14 - signed chap.249
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Designates June nineteenth, known as Juneteenth, as a public holiday.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designates June nineteenth, known as Juneteenth, as a public holiday.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-07-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-07-16 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-10-14Senatesigned chap.249
2020-10-02Assemblydelivered to governor
2020-07-23SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2020-07-23SenatePASSED SENATE
2020-07-23Senate3RD READING CAL.926
2020-07-23SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S8598
2020-07-22SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2020-07-22Assemblydelivered to senate
2020-07-22Assemblypassed assembly
2020-07-20Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.212
2020-07-20Assemblyrules report cal.212
2020-07-20Assemblyreported
2020-07-16Assemblyreported referred to rules
2020-06-10Assemblyreferred to governmental operations

Same As/Similar To

S08598 (Same As) 2020-07-23 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10628

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback