NY S08429 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - SIGNED CHAP.333
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - SIGNED CHAP.333
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to state aid eligibility for library construction; provides that aid shall be provided on approved expenses incurred during the period commencing July first and ending June thirtieth for up to six years, or until the project is completed, whichever occurs first.
Title
Relates to state aid eligibility for library construction; provides that aid shall be provided on approved expenses incurred during the period commencing July first and ending June thirtieth for up to six years, or until the project is completed, whichever occurs first.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - Senate - Senate Libraries Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - Senate - Senate Libraries Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-30 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.333 |
2022-06-22 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2022-05-24 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-05-24 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-05-24 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.348 |
2022-05-24 | Assembly | substituted for a9487a |
2022-05-10 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2022-05-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-10 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-05 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-05-04 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-05-03 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1014 |
2022-03-22 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 8429A |
2022-03-22 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2022-03-09 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2022-02-28 | Senate | REFERRED TO LIBRARIES |
Same As/Similar To
A09487 (Same As) 2022-05-24 - substituted by s8429a