NY S08400 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-14 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-14 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits certain unfunded mandates on political subdivisions of the state.
Title
Prohibits certain unfunded mandates on political subdivisions of the state.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-07 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-14 | Assembly | OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2018-05-18 | Assembly | TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION |
2018-05-07 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2018-05-07 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-05-07 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-05-07 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1043 |
2018-05-07 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-05-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |