NY S08378 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-23 - VETOED MEMO.171
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-23 - VETOED MEMO.171
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the application of pesticides to certain local freshwater wetlands for local governments that have implemented a freshwater wetlands protection law; provides that any local law or ordinance adopted pursuant to this section shall take effect on the first day of January after it shall have been adopted.
Title
Prohibits the application of pesticides to certain local freshwater wetlands for local governments that have implemented a freshwater wetlands protection law; provides that any local law or ordinance adopted pursuant to this section shall take effect on the first day of January after it shall have been adopted.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 117 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 51 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 51 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-23 | Senate | VETOED MEMO.171 |
2022-12-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.620 |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | substituted for a9079b |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2022-06-02 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-06-02 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-06-02 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1859 |
2022-06-02 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-05-27 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 8378C |
2022-05-27 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2022-05-23 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 8378B |
2022-05-23 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2022-03-30 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 8378A |
2022-03-30 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2022-02-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
Same As/Similar To
A09079 (Same As) 2022-06-03 - substituted by s8378c