NY A09079 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-03 - substituted by s8378c
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-03 - substituted by s8378c
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the application of pesticides to certain local freshwater wetlands for local governments that have implemented a freshwater wetlands protection law; provides that any local law or ordinance adopted pursuant to this section shall take effect on the first day of January after it shall have been adopted.
Title
Prohibits the application of pesticides to certain local freshwater wetlands for local governments that have implemented a freshwater wetlands protection law; provides that any local law or ordinance adopted pursuant to this section shall take effect on the first day of January after it shall have been adopted.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-03 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-03 | Assembly | substituted by s8378c |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | amended on third reading 9079b |
2022-05-05 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.620 |
2022-05-03 | Assembly | reported |
2022-04-29 | Assembly | amend by restoring to original print 9079 |
2022-03-30 | Assembly | print number 9079a |
2022-03-30 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2022-03-22 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2022-01-31 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S08378 (Same As) 2022-12-23 - VETOED MEMO.171