NY S08362 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-7)
Status: Introduced on May 3 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10301B
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Includes the use of farmer-purchased farmland protection agreements in the commissioner's evaluation of applications for funding for agricultural protection plans.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Includes the use of farmer-purchased farmland protection agreements in the commissioner's evaluation of applications for funding for agricultural protection plans.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Senate - Senate Agriculture Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-20SenateSUBSTITUTED BY A10301B
2018-06-20SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.2119
2018-06-05SenatePRINT NUMBER 8362A
2018-06-05SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO RULES
2018-06-05SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2018-05-03SenateREFERRED TO AGRICULTURE

Same As/Similar To

A10301 (Same As) 2018-07-31 - signed chap.158

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback