CA AB3258 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 7851, 7852, 7853, 7855, 7872, and 7873 of the Labor Code, relating to safety in employment.
Title
Refinery and chemical plants.
Sponsors
Asm. Isaac Bryan [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2024-03-21 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended. |
2024-03-21 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2024-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. |
2024-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Labor Code | 7851 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 7852 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 7853 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 7855 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 7872 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 7873 | Amended Code | Citation Text |