NY A10301 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 40-6)
Status: Passed on July 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-31 - signed chap.158
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 40-6)
Status: Passed on July 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-31 - signed chap.158
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Includes the use of farmer-purchased farmland protection agreements in the commissioner's evaluation of applications for funding for agricultural protection plans.
Title
Includes the use of farmer-purchased farmland protection agreements in the commissioner's evaluation of applications for funding for agricultural protection plans.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-31 | Senate | signed chap.158 |
2018-07-19 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2018-06-20 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-20 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.2119 |
2018-06-20 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8362A |
2018-06-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.348 |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | rules report cal.348 |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | reported |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | print number 10301b |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | amend and recommit to agriculture |
2018-05-01 | Assembly | print number 10301a |
2018-05-01 | Assembly | amend and recommit to agriculture |
2018-04-10 | Assembly | referred to agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
S08362 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10301B