NY S08182 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-06-05 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7939B
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires telemarketers to provide certain information no later than the first thirty seconds of the commencement of a call; requires telemarketers to disclose the address of any company on whose behalf the telemarketer is providing telemarketing services on any website owned or operated by the telemarketer and in written communication to customers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires telemarketers to provide certain information no later than the first thirty seconds of the commencement of a call; requires telemarketers to disclose the address of any company on whose behalf the telemarketer is providing telemarketing services on any website owned or operated by the telemarketer and in written communication to customers.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-06-05SenateSUBSTITUTED BY A7939B
2024-05-28SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1499
2024-05-28SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2024-05-14SenatePRINT NUMBER 8182B
2024-05-14SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CONSUMER PROTECTION
2024-05-03SenatePRINT NUMBER 8182A
2024-05-03SenateAMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO CONSUMER PROTECTION
2024-01-11SenateREFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION

Same As/Similar To

A07939 (Same As) 2024-11-25 - signed chap.539

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback