NY S08164 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-06 - returned to senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-06 - returned to senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the town of Chester to impose a five percent hotel and motel tax; provides for the repeal of such provisions upon expiration thereof.
Title
Authorizes the town of Chester to impose a five percent hotel and motel tax; provides for the repeal of such provisions upon expiration thereof.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 101 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Senate - Senate Investigations And Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Senate - Senate Investigations And Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-06 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2024-06-06 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2024-06-06 | Assembly | home rule request |
2024-06-06 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.502 |
2024-06-06 | Assembly | substituted for a9289 |
2024-06-05 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2024-06-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-06-05 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2024-05-23 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-05-22 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-05-21 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1418 |
2024-01-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A09289 (Same As) 2024-06-06 - substituted by s8164