NY S08140 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 6 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9966A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 6 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9966A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to a provisional permit for clinical laboratory technology.
Title
Relates to a provisional permit for clinical laboratory technology.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - Senate - Senate Higher Education Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - Senate - Senate Higher Education Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-19 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A9966A |
2018-06-19 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.2006 |
2018-06-19 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-05-15 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2018-05-04 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 8140A |
2018-05-04 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2018-04-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A09966 (Same As) 2018-07-31 - signed chap.147