NY A09966 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on July 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-31 - signed chap.147
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to a provisional permit for clinical laboratory technology.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to a provisional permit for clinical laboratory technology.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-31Senatesigned chap.147
2018-07-19Assemblydelivered to governor
2018-06-19SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-19SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-19Senate3RD READING CAL.2006
2018-06-19SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S8140A
2018-06-13SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2018-06-13Assemblydelivered to senate
2018-06-13Assemblypassed assembly
2018-06-12Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.114
2018-06-12Assemblyrules report cal.114
2018-06-11Assemblyreported
2018-06-07Assemblyreported referred to rules
2018-05-31Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2018-05-14Assemblyreported referred to codes
2018-05-07Assemblyprint number 9966a
2018-05-07Assemblyamend and recommit to higher education
2018-03-02Assemblyreferred to higher education

Same As/Similar To

S08140 (Same As) 2018-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9966A

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A09966&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A09966&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A09966
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A09966&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A09966A
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A09966&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A09966&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A09966&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A09966&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC4
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A09966&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/A9966#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback