NY S08135 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-28 - SIGNED CHAP.497
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-28 - SIGNED CHAP.497
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the assessor of the county of Nassau to accept from Yeshiva Nishmas HaTorah, Inc. an application for exemption from real property taxes.
Title
Authorizes the assessor of the county of Nassau to accept from Yeshiva Nishmas HaTorah, Inc. an application for exemption from real property taxes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-28 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.497 |
2018-12-18 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.353 |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | substituted for a10374b |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2018-06-18 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-18 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1872 |
2018-06-18 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-06-07 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 8135A |
2018-06-07 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2018-04-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A10374 (Same As) 2018-06-19 - substituted by s8135a