NY S08124 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 6 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-18 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10369
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 6 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-18 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10369
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to requiring certain public school facilities to retain on premises at least one functional cardiac automated external defibrillator, in relation to naming such act the "Louis Acompora AED's in schools act".
Title
Relates to requiring certain public school facilities to retain on premises at least one functional cardiac automated external defibrillator, in relation to naming such act the "Louis Acompora AED's in schools act".
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-18 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A10369 |
2018-05-07 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-05-02 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-05-01 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.964 |
2018-04-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A10369 (Same As) 2018-08-24 - signed chap.249